Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1139975
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 31 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 27 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 02 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 17 September 2014 On Time