ST. MATTHEW'S PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St. Matthews Project provides a safe and encouraging environment where 3 to 25 year-olds can come together and enjoy structured football sessions and other activities. We help children and young people living mainly in the Tulse Hill and Coldharbour wards of Lambeth fulfil their potential and have a real impact on their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £59,100 from 12 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 22 March 2011: Standard registration
- SMP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lekan Ojumu | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Greenfield | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Keen | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|||||
JAMES ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.50k | £210.54k | £202.21k | £373.12k | £324.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.36k | £176.58k | £183.15k | £277.38k | £357.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.47k | £94.43k | £38.19k | £32.54k | £59.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/03/2011
Charitable objects
1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN THE SOUTH BRIXTON AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCED AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPAPCITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVISUALS B ADVANCING EDUCATION C RELIEVING UNEMPLYMENT D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE SOUTH BRIXTON AREA WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON FO THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, PVOERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 6 AND 25 BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 GASKARTH ROAD
LONDON
SW12 9NW
- Phone:
- 02086732198
- Email:
- leedema@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window