HAMPTON & HAMPTON HILL VOLUNTARY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting health and well being in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,225 from 2 government contract(s) and £17,602 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
113 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 27 January 2011: Standard registration
- 18 October 2011: Funds received from 270916 HAMPTON AND HAMPTON HILL VOLUNTARY CARE GROUP
- HAMPTON & HAMPTON HILL VOLUNTARY CARE GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JAMES HORSLEY | Chair | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Helen Ford | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bodhi Sato Liu | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Wendy Anne Jones | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asoka Bandara Karandawala | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James David Munby | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Nicholas Searle | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.34k | £204.35k | £229.57k | £116.74k | £141.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.56k | £159.68k | £151.21k | £159.20k | £173.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £14.19k | £14.11k | £14.11k | £14.25k | £15.23k | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.74k | £60.85k | £42.49k | £17.90k | £17.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/04/2011 as amended on 28 Nov 2023 as amended on 25 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: A) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE SERVICES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF OUR COMMUNITY WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SERVICES ARE INTENDED AND OF TRAINING THEM IN THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR IN REGARD TO MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE; C) TO PROVIDE FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR MEN AND WOMEN AND TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID COMMUNITY; D) TO UNDERTAKE AND PROMOTE STUDY, RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF WORK IN THE SOCIAL SERVICES BY VOLUNTEERS EITHER AS INDIVIDUALS OR IN GROUPS OR AS MEMBERS OF ORGANISATIONS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH; E) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE HEREINAFTER CONSTITUTED SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE CONTINUING CARE OF THE AGED, THOSE PHYSICALLY AND MENTALLY DISABLED AND THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Greenwood Community Centre
1A School Road
Hampton
TW12 1QL
- Phone:
- 02089795326
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window