Accounts and annual returns HORN OF AFRICA SERVICES & DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1140324
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 March 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required