OPTOMETRY GIVING SIGHT

Charity number: 1142250
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Optometry Giving Sight is the only global fundraising initiative that specifically targets the prevention of blindness and impaired vision due to uncorrected refractive error - simply the need for an eye exam and pair of glasses. Optometry Giving Sight funds the development of sustainable eye care projects in communities where these do not currently exist.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £2,461
Total expenditure: £372

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Argentina
  • Bangladesh
  • El Salvador
  • Eritrea
  • Haiti
  • India
  • Malawi
  • Mali
  • Mexico
  • Moldova
  • Mozambique
  • Nicaragua
  • Peru
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • Tanzania
  • United States
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 2011: Standard registration
  • 24 November 2021: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 24 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1081695 VISION ACTION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £91.51k £101.73k £56.16k £51.90k £2.46k
Total expenditure £73.72k £101.73k £42.04k £6.12k £372
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 November 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 November 2019 17 days late
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On Time