THE WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1143246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting and advancing workforce education, training and skills; Improving the design and implementation of workforce development practices and policies; Providing integrated learning, accreditation and digital solutions; Undertaking and assisting in the identification, design and recognition of continuing professional development for individuals and teams

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2011: Standard registration
  • 12 September 2017: Funds received from 1107141 JSSC
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SKILLS FOR HEALTH LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Newman Chair 01 April 2017
THE FRONTLINE ORGANISATION
Received: On time
Dr Jacob ABBOUD Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Mr Arvind Krishen MALHOTRA Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Lisa Winward Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Jonathan Restell Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Sara Munro Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
Erika Bannerman Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
Dr Rowena Hill Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
Niamh Li-Ban McKenna Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
Keith Fraser Trustee 08 April 2020
Emergency Services Cenotaph
Charity reporting is overdue by 1208 days
BIRMINGHAM SPORT AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY TRUST
Received: On time
TRANSFORMATION PARTNERSHIP TRUST
Received: 67 days late
Daniel Langton Trustee 30 May 2019
None on record
JOHN ROGERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.32m £8.06m £9.36m £11.35m £10.36m
Total expenditure £10.80m £10.04m £9.14m £10.65m £10.32m
Income from government contracts £271.00k £271.00k N/A N/A £278.32k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £4.87m £3.51m £3.69m £4.75m £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.35m £4.49m £5.66m £6.56m £5.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £101.23k £64.59k £10.91k £36.38k £208.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.35m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.69m £7.03m £6.41m £6.86m £6.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.11m £3.01m £2.72m £3.78m £3.99m
Expenditure - Governance £24.83k £19.36k £25.10k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £1.11m £2.73m £2.94m £2.99m £2.61m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £12.76m £9.68m £8.90m £9.54m £9.23m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.17m £3.70m £2.90m £2.89m £2.16m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 22 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 02 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 14 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Workforce Development Trust Ltd
Vertigo
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
020 7391 7189