THE DISCOVERY OF TALENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Employment support and Training Provisions Advice and Guidance on Welfare Benefits,Immigration Youth activities Sport and physical activities Education Debt Management Advice Befriending Antisocial behaviour Domestic violence Homeless Signposting to a free legal representative
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK SALI MASS | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Bernadette Mbala | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Mayombo | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin Ngolu Nseya | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adele Dikoko | Trustee | 20 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.52k | £12.53k | £25.00k | £10.00k | £11.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.49k | £12.50k | £15.00k | £9.00k | £9.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/06/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS FROM FRENCH SPEAKING AFRICAN COUNTRIES, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE IN SUCH MATTERS AS HEALTH, HOUSING, EMPLOYMENT, IMMIGRATION AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION. 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 LIVING IN BIRMINGHAM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saturn Centre
Spring Road
Ettingshall
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV4 6JX
- Phone:
- 01902401400
- Email:
- DISCOVERYOFT@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window