THE VINE HOUSE TRUST

Charity Number: 501524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income from the Trust is used for the benefit of the inhabitants of Shepshed and the neighbourhood by advancement of religion generally and by the advancement of education through the provision of facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £388
Total expenditure: £380

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTINE HALLAM Chair
None on record
LYNDA JANE ATKIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £730 £745 £575 £398 £388
Total expenditure £10.00k £0 £60 £60 £380
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 08 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 November 2024 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 04 May 2023 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 March 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 LEICESTER ROAD
SHEPSHED
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 9DF
Phone:
01509 502974
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available