THE FREE RADIO CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises an annual "Walkathon" which is a sponsored walk around Birmingham, the net proceeds of which are distributed primarily to the nominated charity(ies). Small donations are also made to those charities and community organisations which provide volunteer marshalls, in recognition of their contribution to the day
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- 08 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1122062 BAUER RADIO'S CASH FOR KIDS CHARITIES
- THE BRMB CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.16k | £588.37k | £27.08k | £14.32k | £212 | |
|
Total expenditure | £334.73k | £652.87k | £18.57k | £16.65k | £660 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £17.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £571.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £623.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 21 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 02 June 2017 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 06 March 2017 | 126 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 15 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 15 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/02/2012
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 31(2) COMPANIES ACT 2006, THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window