Financial history CAERWENT PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1142227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £34.89k £20.44k £7.57k £22.17k £31.61k
Total expenditure £26.78k £12.93k £10.95k £23.70k £37.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £13.80k N/A £2.00k £2.80k