THE MOVEMENT FOR REFORM JUDAISM

Charity number: 1139806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Movement are to promote and foster Judaism and to promote any charitable purpose calculated to further the welfare of the Jewish people in the United Kingdom, in Israel or elsewhere in the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 2011: Standard registration
  • 22 May 2012: Funds received from 250060 MOVEMENT FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rabbi Robyn Ashworth-steen Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
rabbi Kath Vardi Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Nicholas Aleksander Trustee 25 June 2023
CCJO RENECASSIN
Received: On time
Judy Ruth Weleminsky Trustee 26 June 2022
None on record
Gabrielle Suzanne Mandell Trustee 26 June 2022
ACTION FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Joell Ovadia Eric Leskin Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Roberto Lampl Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
Michele Ruth Saffer Trustee 19 November 2020
THE MANOR HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
SHOFAR DAY CARE CENTRE
Received: On time
Daniel Robert Benjamin Trustee 28 June 2020
SPELTHORNE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Melvin Pedro Trustee 28 June 2020
ICHS DEVELOPMENT LIMITED
Received: On time
SUKKAT SHALOM REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
Roy Saatchi Trustee 30 June 2019
None on record
Ian Michael Lancaster Trustee 30 June 2019
None on record
Kathryn Anne Hirst Trustee 30 June 2019
None on record
PAUL ANTHONY LANGSFORD Trustee 26 June 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.13m £1.82m £1.83m £2.74m £2.82m
Total expenditure £3.27m £1.93m £1.92m £2.55m £2.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.06k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £613.86k £538.57k £727.34k £727.61k £668.25k
Income - Other trading activities £1.40m £0 £155.41k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £996.50k £1.12m £849.85k £1.90m £2.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.04k £766 £78 £2.42k £17.78k
Income - Other £116.40k £166.34k £101.70k £103.57k £82.38k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £250.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.10m £1.78m £1.81m £2.49m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £164.22k £147.20k £104.45k £64.11k £135.08k
Expenditure - Governance £100.41k £66.81k £54.14k £72.76k £73.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £36.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £309.62k £298.00k £290.33k £277.91k £273.50k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.05m £1.73m £1.62m £1.90m £2.00m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £470.19k £245.83k £211.07k £296.68k £314.54k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
STERNBERG CENTRE
80 EAST END ROAD
LONDON
N3 2SY
Phone:
02083495723