WELL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1142161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious worship and christian outreach and support. Locally, nationally, and worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £248,908
Total expenditure: £267,733

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackpool
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WELL CHURCH; WELL CHURCH - ANSDELL; WELL CHURCH - BLACKPOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN HOBIN Trustee 30 October 2022
None on record
STEWART WHITLEY Trustee 13 April 2012
None on record
ALAN BUCKLEY Trustee 13 April 2012
None on record
RICK HOOKE Trustee 31 May 2011
None on record
RICK OLDLAND Trustee 31 May 2011
Harvest Alliance UK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £251.36k £248.69k £232.98k £310.13k £248.91k
Total expenditure £253.91k £243.52k £267.55k £270.50k £267.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.00k £11.76k £10.46k £26.03k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE WELL CHURCH
ANSDELL ROAD NORTH
LYTHAM ST ANNES
LANCASHIRE
FY8 4EZ
Phone:
01253739043