WORD OF FIRE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- the advancement of Christian faith - the provision of the place or places of worship and facilities for the use of the community - the relief of social disadvantages - the advancement of education , training or retraining - the protection of holistic health (physical and mental health) - the relief of poverty, sickness and distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 12 August 2011: Standard registration
- W. F. M (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudio Mbata | Chair | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS FIFI NYEKOMA MBATA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GINGA KIMOTO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.40k | £5.95k | £9.29k | £9.12k | £9.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £4.96k | £8.04k | £7.04k | £9.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2011
Charitable objects
OBJECTIVES THE CHURCH IS FOUNDED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY, AND THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1.PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. 2.INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. 3.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN COVENTRY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A)PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B)INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CONSTANCE CLOSE
COVENTRY
CV3 1LN
- Phone:
- 07402211151
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window