DABS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity does not respond to unsolicited requests for donations/support. The trustees review existing UK charities and their projects and support those projects which (i) are within the areas of interest of the trustees and of the Charity and (ii) appear well run and capable of achieving their goals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Leslie Manson | Trustee |
|
||||||
Bernard Manson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.70k | £176 | £1.66k | £2.70k | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 31 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES 4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION, OR THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY 5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT 6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE, OR SCIENCE, OR 7 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW FOR THE TIME BEING OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TOTNES WALK
LONDON
N2 0AD
- Phone:
- 07879118875
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window