FUN FOR ALL HOLIDAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering holiday play schemes during the Easter and Summer breaks to disabled young people with severe learning difficulties (including some with additional conditions such as autism and complex medical needs) from New Fosseway School in South Bristol. This provides essential respite for the families and opportunities for the children to experience new things in a fun but safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Janet Jenkins | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Itiesha Chester | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Brain | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2025 | 1096 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/04/2010
Charitable objects
"TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH SEVERE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES (INCLUDING CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS SUCH AS AUTISM AND COMPLEX MEDICAL NEEDS), THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS RESIDENT IN BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS AND HOLIDAY ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING SHORT HOLIDAY BREAKS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGE LEARNING CAMPUS
WILLIAM JESSOP WAY
BRISTOL
BS13 0RL
- Phone:
- 01173534472
- Email:
- cjenkins@tila.school
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window