ABACUS PRE SCHOOL NURSERY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School offering Early Early Years Education for children aged between 2.5 up to school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 07 April 2011: Standard registration
- 30 July 2012: Funds received from 1024415 ABACUS PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren York | Chair | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Louise Hibbert | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Sophie Slosarczyk | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kim Helen Pretorius | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Arden | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOCELYN LEWRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.54k | £66.47k | £74.13k | £67.36k | £75.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.64k | £56.12k | £63.72k | £62.06k | £62.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.89k | £48.74k | £43.81k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 4.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 4.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 4.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRESCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O DASSETT SCHOOL
MEMORIAL ROAD
FENNY COMPTON
SOUTHAM
WARKS
CV47 2XU
- Phone:
- 01295771050
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window