Financial history CITY PREGNANCY COUNSELLING & PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity Number: 1140992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £39.24k £61.42k £11.93k £57.99k £5.26k
Total expenditure £27.35k £38.18k £35.96k £38.82k £30.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A