FARNBOROUGH FOODBANK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the distress and hardship of people/families suffering financial difficulties(within Rushmoor and if neccessary other parts of the U.K.) by providing boxes/parcels of emergency food to ease their crissis. The food parcels will consist of tinned and dried food (donated by the public) and will be issued either directly or through agency partners approved by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 August 2011: Standard registration
- 10 April 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1132865 Cove Parochial Church Council
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.04k | £103.35k | £35.39k | £49.41k | £45.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.03k | £45.81k | £10.88k | £14.37k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN FARNBOROUGH AND THROUGHOUT THE RUSHMOOR AREA WHO ARE IN A CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (‘BENEFICIARIES’) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) SUPPLYING BOXES TO BENEFICIARIES, EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH AGENCY PARTNERS APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, SUCH BOXES TO CONTAIN TINNED AND DRIED FOODS TO ENSURE A HEALTHY, BALANCED AND NUTRITIOUS DIET SUFFICIENT FOR UP TO 3 DAYS. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY AND ADVISORY SERVICES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window