Financial history Sale Sharks Foundation

Charity number: 1142956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £798.93k £702.24k £819.54k £886.26k £951.14k
Total expenditure £828.02k £709.43k £806.78k £989.18k £907.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £62.99k N/A £47.11k
Income from government grants £7.13k £90.00k £14.75k N/A £40.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £242.78k £231.18k £198.49k £130.02k £454.86k
Income - Other trading activities £75.18k £75.18k £145.16k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £477.74k £394.18k £474.60k £751.91k £491.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.23k £0 £0 £4.32k £5.29k
Income - Other £0 £1.70k £1.29k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £788.07k £673.56k £742.16k £930.67k £898.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.96k £35.87k £64.62k £58.51k £9.23k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.25k £4.65k £4.14k £20.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0