Trustees THE ROYAL AIR FORCE GLIDING AND SOARING ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1140665

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN KYLE WIGHTMAN | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CARL JOHN PETERS | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUKE SPENCER DALE | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JACKSON STRINGER | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Watson | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEILL OWEN ATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.