NASRUL-LAHI-L- FATIH SOCIETY OF NIGERIA (MANCHESTER CENTRAL) ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities. Teaching men, women and children about Islam as a way of life. Teaching how to live in harmony with fellow neighbours irrespective of belief. Teaching of morals aiming towards reducing antisocial behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 06 July 2011: Standard registration
- NASFAT ISLAMIC & COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- NASFAT MANCHESTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GBOLA BELLO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Rasheed Bello | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keji Jimoh Bankole | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adewale Musbau Okunubi | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mutahir Abiola Ojo | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADENIKE OLAJUMOKE AYOOLA | Trustee |
|
||||||
BUNMI ABDULRAUF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.61k | £69.16k | £52.82k | £67.05k | £106.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.67k | £42.68k | £52.45k | £73.71k | £101.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 December 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
02 December 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
09 November 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION CLASSES. 3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
227 Droylsden Road
MANCHESTER
M40 1NY
- Phone:
- 01616834925
- Email:
- nasfatbot@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window