PAKISTAN RISING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and help create a progressive, educated Pakistan by helping the poor and needy in Pakistan, through emergency relief aid during natural disasters etc. to providing education to impoverished children and adults in Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 April 2011: Standard registration
- 28 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.65k | £23.65k | £1.63k | £5.34k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.53k | £20.49k | £15.30k | £4.76k | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 02 October 2017 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 09 September 2016 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/03/2011
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROV S ON OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND SHELTER WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PAKISTAN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLS FOR UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window