THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD FREEDOM HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith Worldwide by the meeting on a twice basis per week to study the Bible and help develop a total man Organising programs for couples so as to foster better christian ethics in our homes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bexley
Governance
- 16 June 2011: Standard registration
- RCCG FREEDOM HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOLA IDUOZE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Gideon Sappor | Trustee | 25 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
OLAYINKA B ADENIYI-ZACCHEUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.24k | £34.46k | £34.54k | £81.30k | £67.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.56k | £24.76k | £34.18k | £56.56k | £59.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 25 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS ON ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS/TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A
Town Square
Erith
Kent
DA8 1RE
- Phone:
- 01322338811
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window