SHEFFIELD CONVERSATION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help refugees and asylum seekers practice English in a friendly, supportive environment and to promote their social inclusion in Sheffield and its environs by; helping people to develop their English through conversation and informal English classes and by social and recreational facilities and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN VINCENT GEORGE HELSDON | Chair | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Ahmed El Malla | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lee Moran | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
James Anthony Dimond | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
VICTOR MUJAKACHI | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Christine Barltrop | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Roberts | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD THOMAS CHESSUM BA | Trustee | 20 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £818 | £0 | £4.70k | £11.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.07k | £312 | £1.02k | £2.92k | £5.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2014 as amended on 19 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1)The promotion of social inclusion for the public benefit among people who are refugees and people seeking asylum in Sheffield and its environs who are socially excluded on the grounds of their social and economic position by a) providing practice and classes in the English language b) providing social and recreational facilities and events involving the local community c) raising public awareness of the issues affecting people seeking asylum and refugees, both generally and in relation to their social exclusion 2) such other charitable purposes for the public benefit as are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England and Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Jessop Fold
Honley
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 6AJ
- Phone:
- 07890992346
- Email:
- info@conversationclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window