CANVEY ISLAND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sales operation for use of members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 02 March 2011: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Haynes | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HAMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DENNIS ROYCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.30k | £10.80k | £17.60k | £18.75k | £21.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.84k | £11.97k | £16.94k | £18.39k | £24.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £396 | £387 | £412 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 12 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 10 DEC 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CULTIVATION OF FLOWERS,FRUIT AND VEGETABLES,TO ENCOURAGE HORTICULTURAL GENERALLY AND TO ASSIST MEMBERS TO OBTAIN HORTICULTURAL REQUIREMENTS ADVANTAGEOUSLY ALL WITHIN THE AREA OF CANVEY ISLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stores
Smallgains Allotments
Smallgains Avenue
Canvey Island
Essex
SS8 8JH
- Phone:
- 07561475237
- Email:
- lab200@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window