Financial history NORFOLK SCHOOLS SAILING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1142627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £45.85k £13.67k £101.25k £203.64k £71.39k
Total expenditure £30.24k £44.30k £60.82k £29.03k £304.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A