NORFOLK SCHOOLS SAILING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Norfolk Schools Sailing Association (NSSA) has been in existence for over 65 years and has provided opportunities for thousands of young people to learn and improve their sailing ability. We run a programme of courses throughout the season for children and for adults who train to become our future instructors. We offer membership at minimal cost, which makes this sport more accessible to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 June 2011: Standard registration
- NSSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Archer | Chair | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Logsdon | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Honey | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||
William Holledge | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Harrison | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Percival | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jennings | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andy Goff | Trustee | 17 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MITCHELMORE | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE ELIZABETH HEAD | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TIMOTHY BONHAM | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ROBERT MILLS | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DAVID ALAN KING | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH BONHAM | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEIL THURLOW | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.85k | £13.67k | £101.25k | £203.64k | £71.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.24k | £44.30k | £60.82k | £29.03k | £304.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2011 as amended on 15 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING IN NORFOLK
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foxhole House
Foxhole
Saxlingham Thorpe
NORWICH
NR15 1UG
- Phone:
- 01508499879
- Email:
- SECRETARY@NSSA.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window