Accounts and annual returns COLALIFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1142516
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time