THE MEGAN THROWER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing equipment to benefit the school children outside the curriculum activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 December 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 March 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Greenhalgh | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LITTLER | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christa Beales | Trustee | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/12/2016 | 08/12/2017 | 08/12/2018 | 08/12/2019 | 08/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225 | £181 | £135 | £230 | £211 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 221 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 221 days | |
Annual return | 08 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 587 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 587 days | |
Annual return | 08 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 952 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 952 days | |
Annual return | 08 December 2020 | 06 June 2022 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 December 2019 | 29 December 2020 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/12/2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GAYTON SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gayton V C Primary School
Lynn Road
Gayton
King's Lynn
PE32 1PA
- Phone:
- 01553636267
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window