Accounts and annual returns SAVE A LIFE (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1140725
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 26 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 26 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 26 October 2015 21 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2015 Not Required