ALL EARS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1142782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Charity are, with particular emphasis on developing countries, the relief of persons with ear disease, hearing impairment or deafness and the preservation and protection of hearing by promoting activities for the prevention, mitigation or relief of avoidable causes of ear disease, hearing impairment and deafness and for the conservation of hearing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £575
Total expenditure: £135

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambodia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Perriam Dr Trustee 21 July 2019
None on record
Hannah Chroston Trustee 21 July 2019
None on record
GLYN VAUGHAN Trustee 07 July 2011
None on record
RUTH THOMSEN BAAT Trustee
None on record
STEVEN WADLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £2.00k £74 £8.00k £4.05k £575
Total expenditure £127 £75 £5.16k £8.12k £135
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodcroft
Kingsdown
CORSHAM
SN13 8BJ
Phone:
07983647757
Email:
No information available