FRIENDS OF LAYSTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1140983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School fund raising

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £5,652
Total expenditure: £6,142

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LAYSTON SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAUREN HICKEY Trustee 23 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.14k £2.83k £1.45k £2.50k £5.65k
Total expenditure £7.64k £6.78k £2.17k £2.95k £6.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 June 2024 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 March 2021 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Layston First School
The Causeway
BUNTINGFORD
Hertfordshire
SG9 9EU
Phone:
01763 271235
Website:

No information available