Trustees DURHAM ACTION ON SINGLE HOUSING LTD
Charity number: 501556

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Henderson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Toes | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Tighe | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Becky Craven | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Rook | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Samuel | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Costello | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Manners | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Halliday | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.