SAMASONS RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Samasons Relief activities were mainly Education, Supporting schools in Midland and Emergency food aid in East Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Djibouti
- Ethiopia
- Somalia
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- SAMASONS RELIEF (Previous name)
- SAMASON'S RELIEF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Osman Qawrah | Chair | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdisalam Hussein Awale | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Yusuf | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sahal Ali | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.49k | £11.63k | £10.13k | £9.10k | £11.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.69k | £9.53k | £3.65k | £2.95k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE, INCLUDING ETHNIC MINORITIES AND PEOPLE FROM EAST AFRICA 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF COMMUNITIES FROM EAST AFRICA OR ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS IN THE UK IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON METING THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS IN THE UK IN SUCH WAY AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 4. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE FROM EAST AFRICA OR IN AN ETHNIC MINORITY, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN OR ABILITY TO ACCESS SERVICES AND COMMUNICATE OR INTEGRATE, BY: A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES THE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B) INCREASING, OR COORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY 5. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN EAST AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 14B
CRAFT CENTRE
8 HIGHGATE SQUARE
BIRMINGHAM
B12 0DU
- Phone:
- 07903491661
- Email:
- info@samasonsrelief.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window