Accounts and annual returns THE STANNINGTON BRASS BAND

Charity Number: 501558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required