Trustees THE STANNINGTON BRASS BAND
Charity Number: 501558

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Phillip George Attrill | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Marie Croft | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Bret Bettles | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Louise Cross | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Alexandra Dowling | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Freya Riding | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Boyd Parris | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA BALL | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dawson Slater | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE DYSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.