Financial history THE PANT AND DOWLAIS COMMUNITY ENGINE HOUSE

Charity number: 1143385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £109 £57 £43 £273 £164
Total expenditure £177 £111 £128 £232 £240
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A