WELLSPRING CHURCH (SOUTHEND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public meetings continued to be held most Sundays. Preaching and teaching ministry was provided by leaders and members of the Church supplemented occasionally by visiting speakers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 08 March 2011: Standard registration
- WELLSPRING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WEBSTER MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Barry Goddard | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH WEBSTER BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.08k | £9.14k | £9.64k | £10.99k | £10.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £8.11k | £6.36k | £15.09k | £12.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 January 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 January 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 10 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND WORLD-WIDE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO NETWORK WITH AND SUPPORT OTHER CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES WHO DO SO. B) TO OFFER RELIEF TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, AND ADDICTION AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UK AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UK AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE RESOURCING AND EQUIPPING OF PERSONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF MINISTRY, MISSION AND CHRISTIAN LEADERSHIP IN THE UK AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD WHERE THE CHARITY MAY BE OPERATING AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellspring Church c/o Age Concern
134 Hamlet Court Road
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
Essex
SS0 7LN
- Phone:
- 01702668074
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window