MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGY SEA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was formed to advance the education of the public in maritime heritage, focusing in particular on maritime archaeological material, including (a) the preservation and investigation of shipwrecked vessels and of historically or otherwise valuable maritime material and (b) the dissemination of the educationally useful results of such investigation to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2011: Standard registration
- MAST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Blondeau | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Dominic Tweddle | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
PETER CHARLES GOODSHIP | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Elisabeth Bussey-Jones | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||
MAJOR GENERAL PATRICK ANTHONY JOHN CORDINGLEY DSO OBE | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Vice Admiral Sir Anthony Knox Dymock | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN-MARC JEFFERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £488.00k | £423.17k | £274.32k | £84.04k | £129.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £442.63k | £467.09k | £269.97k | £162.46k | £115.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £428.71k | £358.10k | £190.56k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2020
(These accounts |
24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 30 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MARITIME HERITAGE, FOCUSING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) ON MARITIME ARCHAEOLOGICAL MATERIAL, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING (A) THE PRESERVATION AND INVESTIGATION OF SHIPWRECKED VESSELS AND OF HISTORICALLY OR OTHERWISE VALUABLE MARITIME MATERIAL AND (B) THE DISSEMINATION OF THE EDUCATIONALLY USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH INVESTIGATION TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 WYCOMBE END
BEACONSFIELD
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
HP9 1NB
- Phone:
- 07768080105
- Email:
- mast@thisismast.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window