Accounts and annual returns THE HARRP TRUST

Charity number: 1140424
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 August 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 21 August 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 11 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 11 August 2014 On Time