Financial history THE HARRP TRUST

Charity Number: 1140424
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £76.52k £149.70k £151.90k £99.89k £41.38k
Total expenditure £81.09k £140.71k £151.84k £102.32k £46.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £27.50k £11.46k £0