R CHILDREN'S TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support to Looked After Children who live in Rotherham, which will enable them to develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. The charity will look to raise funds through contributions, donations and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
Governance
- 28 June 2011: Standard registration
- 21 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 13 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 27 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND (RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF) LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN AND CHILDREN WHO ARE IDENTIED AS POTENTIALLY BECOMING LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN; AND LOOKED AFTER CHILDREN LEAVING CARE IN THE ROTHERHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window