Trustees IMPSTONE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity Number: 1140075

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Marshall | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Denise Day | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Georgina Calladine | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth West | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Francesca Kingston | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MCGARVIE | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Amanda Davies | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Samantha Kuflik | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.