Financial history INFANT CLUB FOOT APPEAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1142858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £127.71k £145.15k £5.50k £648 £81.14k
Total expenditure £136.90k £140.65k £82.84k £60.13k £39.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A