Summerhill Trust ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of community facilities in and around the Summerhill area of the West End of Newcastle
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 27 January 2011: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF SUMMERHILL LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Anthony Sargent CBE | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dan Heaney | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Nabeela Ali | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen McStravick | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Maxwell | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWIN TIMOTHY PEEL | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jade Collins | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Dougal | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.57k | £40.49k | £74.17k | £110.80k | £126.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.15k | £29.61k | £55.81k | £59.00k | £77.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £22.69k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DEC 2010 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO TAKE OVER ALL THE ASSETS AND UNDERTAKING OF THE UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION KNOWN AS ‘THE FRIENDS OF SUMMERHILL’; AND 2) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS (‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’) PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ADVANCING EDUCATION, PROMOTING THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY FACILITIES AND CENTRE IN AND AROUND SUMMERHILL PAVILION, PARK AND GREENS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Summerhill Bowling Club
Winchester Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 6EH
- Phone:
- 07528453524
- Email:
- hello@summerhilltrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window