Accounts and annual returns YOUTH MEDIA GROUP

Charity number: 1140464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required