WIMBLEDON WI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting learning and personal development of women through eg lectures covering disciplines such as the arts, culture, health and social welfare, participation in groups with activities such as arts and crafts, walking. Encouraging members to take an interest in issues of national and local importance particularly relevant to the lives and welfare of women. Fundraising for local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miriam Phillips | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela McCleave | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Smith | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Maher | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CHALLACOMBE | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Kilgour | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dulcie Edwards | Trustee | 09 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.47k | £2.42k | £9.64k | £11.35k | £10.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.21k | £3.17k | £9.11k | £11.17k | £10.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/2008
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIMBLEDON WI
SURREY FEDERATION
6 PARIS
PARKLANDS
RAILTON ROAD
GUILDFOR
- Phone:
- 01483233230
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window