KEGWORTH HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kegworth Heritage Centre is a place for researching, recording and preserving Kegworth life, past present and future, as evidenced through artefacts, photographs, records and personal memories. As the village changes with time, the Heritage Centre will pass these on to others to provide a continuum, demonstrating how the intrinsic values of Kegworth life remain unchanged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 26 July 1993: Standard registration
- THE KEGWORTH VILLAGE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE KEGWORTH VILLAGE ASSOCIATION AND MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Victoria Powell | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Charles Gill | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John William Billett | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.43k | £111 | £870 | £10.79k | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.58k | £8.49k | £3.71k | £8.47k | £9.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | £782 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 FEBRUARY 1972, AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 2006 AND 17 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2017 as amended on 09 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORY IN THE PARISH OF KEGWORTH AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY. (B) TO PROMOTE TO THE BEST OF ITS ABILITY AND POWERS THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND PARTICULARLY FOR THE INHABITANTS OF KEGWORTH, OF LANDS, BUILDINGS, AND OBJECTS OF BEAUTY OR OF HISTORICAL INTEREST IN THE PARISH OF KEGWORTH OR ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY (C) TO ADMINISTER THE KEGWORTH MUSEUM THE BUILDING HOUSING THE MUSEUM AND THE ARTEFACTS WITHIN THE MUSEUM WHICH IS OWNED BY THE ASSOCIATION (D) TO DISPLAY SUCH ARTEFACTS AND TO COLLECT FURTHER SUITABLE ARTEFACTS DONATED FOR THE MUSEUM ARCHIVE AS APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KEGWORTH AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Linked charities
- 26 July 1993 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 HIGH STREET
KEGWORTH
DERBY
LEICESTERSHIRE
DE74 2DA
- Phone:
- 01509670137
- Email:
- info@kegworthmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window