Financial history WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1141792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £113.34k £90.37k £170.03k £116.63k £121.75k
Total expenditure £110.64k £92.68k £175.05k £116.98k £109.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A