WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. We enable worship and prayer, learning more about the Gospel and developing people's knowledge and trust in Jesus; provide pastoral care, run a debt advice centre and support work with children and adults in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 May 2011: Standard registration
- WOTTON BAPTIST CHURCH; WBC (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Eyre | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr John Andrew Lockton | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah-Louise Sudlow | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arlene Greenwood | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Barker | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.34k | £90.37k | £170.03k | £116.63k | £121.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.64k | £92.68k | £175.05k | £116.98k | £109.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 16/09/2010 as amended on 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baptist Church
Rope Walk
Wotton-under-Edge
GL12 7AA
- Phone:
- 01453844726
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window